HI SB789 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB789
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes minimum wage rates annually from 1/1/2020, to 1/1/2024. Provides lower minimum wage rates for employees who receive employer-sponsored health benefits under the Hawaii Prepaid Health Care Act. Includes persons with disabilities under generally applicable minimum wage requirements. (SB789 HD2)
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 752). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2170) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, Kim, Moriwaki, Wakai. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB789 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).