HI SB803 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a four-year pilot program requiring DAGS to implement irrigation water conservation best management practices, as established by the Landscape Industry Council of Hawaii and report to the Legislature. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB803 HD1)
Title
Water Conservation; Best Management Practices; Public Agency; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:10PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senator(s) Shimabukuro discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, Yamane, Lowen Co-Chairs; Coffman, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Shimabukuro, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 550). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1604), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:17PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from WAL/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-13 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-15 | House | Re-referred to WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 38 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 209) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 1:16PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1017 (Same As) 2013-01-30 - Re-referred to EEP, WAL/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9