HI SB809 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB809
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the allowable scope of service contracts regulated by the Insurance Commissioner to include contracts for certain motor vehicle repair and replacement services.
Title
Relating To Service Contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB809 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB154 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 195, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
HB154 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 195, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=809&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB809_.HTM |