HI SB815 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the judiciary for the Honolulu Zero To Three Court Program to fund staffing-related, program, and service costs. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB815 HD2)
Title
Zero to Three Court; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 12:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 4:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, Har, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Green, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 551). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1506) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1436 (Same As) 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).