HI SB817 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulations for the sale of stored property insurance by self-service storage facility owners. Requires owners to hold a limited lines license to sell, solicit, or offer coverage under a stored property insurance policy. Effective 1/1/2020. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Self-service Storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 100) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 100). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto, D. Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, McDermott. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 547). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1964), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1510), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 190) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.