HI SB823 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to post notice of employees' rights under Hawaii's family leave law. (SB823 HD1)
Title
Family Leave; Posting of Notice
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-13 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 483). | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 463). | |
2009-04-06 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-09. | |
2009-04-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 359). | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-02-09. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-24-09 7:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Takai, Wakai, Wooley excused (4). | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EBM. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Saiki, Souki, Pine. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-03-09 10:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Referred to LAB, EBM, referral sheet 23 | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-23-09. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Bunda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to LBR. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB319 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 115, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1218).