HI SB823 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 131, on 6/16/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 131, on 6/16/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides procurement authority to semi-autonomous county public transit agencies, thus allowing them to function as semi-autonomous agencies in their respective counties. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB823 HD1)
Title
Procurement; Public Transit Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | (H) Act 131, on 6/16/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). | |
2011-06-21 | (S) Act 131, 6/16/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 660). | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) One Day Notice 04-21-11. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-21-11. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, McKelvey, Ichiyama Co-Chairs; Johanson. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 475). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1565), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from TRN/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/ERB on Monday, 03-21-11 10:45AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to TRN/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 197) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Reported from PGM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM/TIA, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |