HI SB823 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the board of regents from meeting in executive session for the purpose of reviewing the performance of the University of Hawaii system president or campus chancellor.
Title
Board of Regents; Executive Session; Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HEA, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=823&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB823_.HTM |