HI SB826 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an exemption that allows an insurer to send a privacy notice to its customers at least once every three years, rather than annually. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Privacy Notice For Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-26-19 8:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB273 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 200, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback