HI SB834 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB834
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the governing body of a county to create, by ordinance, a process for the recordation and enforcement of solar easements. Allows counties to require individuals claiming a solar right to record that right by filing a declaration with the county clerk. Permits the governing body of a county to require, by ordinance, the trimming of vegetation that blocks solar radiation from solar energy devices. Authorizes the ordinance to include a designation for the cost of trimming.
Title
Relating To Solar Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB834 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB1262 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1262 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=834&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB834_.HTM |