HI SB835 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a community liaison to the membership of the state board on geographic names. Requires the department of land and natural resources to publish and send a listing of its decisions, along with other information, to state and other agencies, and provide the same publication, along with pertinent information, to the United States Board on Geographic Names. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Board On Geographic Names.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.