HI SB836 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB836
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the allocation of funds from transient accommodations tax revenue to the special land and development fund to improve certain state resources and services.
Title
Relating To The Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:10PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB836 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HB548 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB548 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=836&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB836_.HTM |