HI SB856 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Act 094, 6/7/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Act 094, 6/7/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes January 30 of each year as "Civil Liberties and the Constitution Day" to celebrate, honor, and educate the public about various individuals' commitment to preserving civil liberties. (SB856 HD1)
Title
Civil Liberties and the Constitution Day; Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Act 094, 6/7/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194). |
2013-06-12 | House | Act 094, on 6/7/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1194). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 754). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers have scheduled a decision making to agree to the House amendments on 04-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takai Chair; Ito, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 552). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-03-13 11:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-08 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 32 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to TEC. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to TEC. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, TEC. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |