HI SB859 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Short form bill relating to capital improvement projects. (SB859 HD1)
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Luke, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (3). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2108) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 275) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 897) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB859 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).