HI SB864 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB864
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii relating to the appointment and retention of justices and judges. Authorizes the senate to approve or reject subsequent terms of office for supreme court justices. Changes the required time frames from 30 to 90 days for the process to appoint and consent to a justice or judge. Harmonizes the senate consent procedures for district court judgeship nominees to mirror the senate consent procedures relating to supreme court justices and intermediate court of appeals and circuit court judges.
Title
Proposing Amendments To The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Amend The Manner In Which Justices And Judges Are Appointed, Consented To, And Retained.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB864 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Consent
Constitution (ConAm)
Constitutional Amendment
Judges
Judicial Retention
Justices
Senate
Senate Consent Procedures
Term Renewals
Constitution (ConAm)
Constitutional Amendment
Judges
Judicial Retention
Justices
Senate
Senate Consent Procedures
Term Renewals
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=864&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB864_.HTM |