HI SB866 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB866
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a minute order entered on a decree of foreclosure incorporating an order of sale or entered on an order confirming the sale of a foreclosed property shall operate as a final, appealable order.
Title
Relating To Foreclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB866 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=866&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB866_.HTM |