HI SB873 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:15PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:15PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards and procedures for income-withholding for purposes of enforcing restitution orders. Amends the definition of "debt" relating to the recovery of money owed to the State to include court-ordered restitution subject to civil enforcement. Provides priority of income withholding orders. Extends victims' access to adult probation records to include access to payment compliance records. Requires that any bail posted by a defendant be applied toward payment of any court-ordered restitution in the same case. Makes an unspecified appropriation to the Judiciary. Effective July 1, 2013. (SB873 HD1)
Title
Collection of Restitution for Crime Victims; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 554). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1594), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1204) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 220) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-05-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |