HI SB873 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB873
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires priority be given to affordable, reserved, and workforce housing applicants who work within twenty-five miles of the housing sought.
Title
Relating To Workforce Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB873 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=873&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB873_.HTM |