HI SB874 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the Hawaiian Home Loan Fund and Hawaiian Home General Loan Fund to assist qualifying lessees purchasing or leasing micro housing units on approved Hawaiian home lands. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing On Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 278) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 724) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 91) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Micro Housing
Tiny Homes
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Micro Housing
Tiny Homes