HI SB888 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 069, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 069, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "new hire" for the purposes of child support enforcement. Effective upon its approval. (SB888 HD1)
Title
Child Support Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Act 069, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169). |
2013-05-01 | House | Act 069, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1567) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |