HI SB891 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts affordable housing units, additions to existing dwelling units, accessory dwelling units, ohana dwelling units, and affordable housing projects developed by the Hawaii Public Housing Authority from school impact fee requirements. (SB891 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Woodson.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 283) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-04SenateReported from HOU/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback