HI SB894 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB894
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the coffee labeling requirements to include ready-to-drink coffee beverages.
Title
Relating To Coffee Labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB894 (Carry Over) 2019-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB143 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
HB143 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=894&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB894_.HTM |