HI SB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 209, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 209, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of cruelty to animals in the first degree from possessing or owning any pet animal or equine animal for a minimum of five years from the conviction date. (CD1)
Title
Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 209, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 209, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 62). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Tsuji, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 490). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Morikawa voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1569) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-13. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 49) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 497) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1186 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).