HI SB911 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 180, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 180, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of latex gloves by personnel working in food establishments or by personnel providing ambulance services or emergency medical services beginning on 1/1/2017. Prohibits the use of latex gloves, with limited exceptions, by personnel working in dental health facilities or health care facilities beginning on 1/1/2017. (CD1)
Title
Latex Gloves; Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act 180, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2016-07-01 | House | Act 180, on 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ohno voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 29-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 29-16). |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, DeCoite, Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 395). |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ohno voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-01 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Oshiro, Say excused (3). |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-01-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Kawakami, Takayama, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McDermott. |
2016-01-22 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-26-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-15 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1238 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.