HI SB912 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows charter schools to use appropriated funds for facilities improvement, rental, and construction and other infrastructure improvements. Appropriates funds for facilities and infrastructure improvement. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB729 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback