HI SB914 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB914
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to allocate revenues from commercial properties within the Banyan Drive redevelopment area to the Banyan Drive Hawaii Redevelopment Agency. Appropriates funds to the Agency for conducting environmental impact and other studies. Requires matching funds from the County of Hawaii. (SB914 HD1)
Title
Relating To Land Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8). |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB914 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8).