HI SB921 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB921
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for one position within the Department of the Attorney General to provide legal advice regarding the Hawaiian language, Hawaiian culture, and Hawaiian shoreline public access rights. Clarifies membership and certain powers and duties of the Law Enforcement Standards Board (Board). Extends the deadline for the completion of certain Board responsibilities. Appropriates funds for an administrator position, a clerical position, and the administration and operating costs of the Board. Effective 3/15/2094. (SB921 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of The Attorney General.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1701) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 294) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 885) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB921 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of the Attorney General
Hawaiian Culture
Hawaiian Language
Law Enforcement Standards Board
Shoreline Public Access Rights
Department of the Attorney General
Hawaiian Culture
Hawaiian Language
Law Enforcement Standards Board
Shoreline Public Access Rights