HI SB928 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB928
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article X, section 6, of the Hawaii State Constitution to repeal the requirement that the Governor make appointments to the University of Hawaii Board of Regents from pools of qualified candidates presented to the Governor by the Candidate Advisory Council for the University of Hawaii Board of Regents. (SB928 HD2)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article X, Section 6, Of The Hawaii State Constitution, To Modify The Appointment Process For The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2090), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takayama, Thielen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 297). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 911) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB928 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused.