HI SB930 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - (H) Act 134, on 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 351).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for medical expenses and immunity from liability for licensed medical personnel providing volunteer medical assistance services on behalf of the State or a county. Effective upon approval. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Medical Assistance Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-24 (H) Act 134, on 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 351).
2010-05-24 (S) Act 134, 5/24/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 592).
2010-05-03 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2010-04-28 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630).
2010-04-27 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645).
2010-04-27 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Sagum, Souki excused (3).
2010-04-27 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2010-04-26 (S) Deferred until 04-27-10.
2010-04-26 (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10.
2010-04-23 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10.
2010-04-23 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10.
2010-04-23 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97-10) as amended in (CD 1).
2010-04-23 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97-10).
2010-04-22 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Karamatsu, Nishimoto, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2010-04-22 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Taniguchi, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2010-04-20 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2010-04-16 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2010-04-12 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557).
2010-04-12 (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Karamatsu, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Belatti, Finnegan.
2010-04-08 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534).
2010-04-08 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533).
2010-04-08 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Taniguchi, Co-Chair(s); Green, Slom.
2010-04-08 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2010-04-07 (S) Deferred until 04-08-10.
2010-04-07 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 329).
2010-04-06 (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2010-04-01 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1180-10), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2010-03-25 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Coffman, Keith-Agaran.
2010-03-22 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2010-03-19 (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused.
2010-03-19 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2010-03-16 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Wakai.
2010-03-12 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-16-10 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
2009-05-11 Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
2009-03-19 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Luke, Mizuno, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Thielen excused (7).
2009-03-18 (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2009-03-13 (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Belatti, Carroll.
2009-03-10 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-13-09 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2009-03-10 (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
2009-03-10 (H) Pass First Reading
2009-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 73).
2009-03-06 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Hemmings). Transmitted to House.
2009-03-05 (S) One Day Notice 03-06-09.
2009-03-05 (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2009-02-26 (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara.
2009-02-24 (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-26-09 9:00am in conference room 016.
2009-02-20 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
2009-02-20 (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO.
2009-02-18 (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2009-02-06 (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-09 3:15pm in conference room 016.
2009-01-30 (S) Referred to HTH, JGO.
2009-01-28 (S) Passed First Reading.
2009-01-26 (S) Introduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1112 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=930&year=2010
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB930_.htm
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB930_CD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB930_HD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB930_HD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_CD1_CCR97-10_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_HD1_HSCR1006_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_HD2_HSCR1180-10_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_HD2_HSCR901-10_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_SSCR309_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/CommReports/SB930_SSCR532_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback