HI SB930 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:00AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to support the investigative stage of the Pacific international space center for exploration systems sustainable concrete initiative. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB930 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems Sustainable Concrete Initiative; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Dela Cruz, Ige, Co-Chair(s); English, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 576).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseFloor amendment passes as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused.
2013-04-05HouseFloor Amendment No. 12 offered by Rep. McKelvey.
2013-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-13.
2013-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-03-19HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-15HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 247) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-02-11SenateReported from PSM/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
2013-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2013-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland.
2013-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/EGH, WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback