HI SB930 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the investigative stage of the Pacific international space center for exploration systems sustainable concrete initiative. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB930 HD2)
Title
Pacific International Space Center for Exploration Systems Sustainable Concrete Initiative; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 9:15AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Dela Cruz, Ige, Co-Chair(s); English, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor amendment passes as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused. |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment No. 12 offered by Rep. McKelvey. |
2013-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-13. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 247) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 594) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |