HI SB930 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of taxation to provide a biennial report on tax expenditures to the legislature on or before September 15th of each odd-numbered year. Requires legislation establishing new tax expenditures to include certain specified provisions. Effective 7/1/2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Tax Expenditures; Biennial Report; Evaluation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-01-28SenateReferred to WAM.
2015-01-26SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback