HI SB930 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission and coordinator to assist the State and counties with developing and implementing various sea level rise adaptation plans and climate change mitigation efforts. Appropriate funds to support the Hawaii climate change initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Climate Change.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback