HI SB933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 164, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 164, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends for 5 years the general excise tax exclusion for amounts received by a managed care support contractor of the TRICARE program for the actual cost or advancement to third-party health care providers pursuant to a contract with the United States. Effective 07/01/2013. (CD1)
Title
TRICARE Program; Health Care; General Excise Tax; Exemption Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 164, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 164, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 44) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 44). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Belatti, Luke, Takayama, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Espero, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takai, Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Takayama, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Espero, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1480), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Mizuno excused (2). |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-08 | House | Re-referred to VMI, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1219 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 21