HI SB936 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on WTL/HWN/HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-19 2:05PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Mauna Kea special fund and Mauna Kea natural area reserve special fund. Reallocates funds from the Mauna Kea lands management special fund to the Mauna Kea special fund and Mauna Kea natural area reserve special fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Natural Resource Management.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/HWN/HRE deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-19 2:05PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/HWN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 2:05PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WTL/HWN/HRE, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback