HI SB940 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - The committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Grants county agencies the explicit right to enter property to investigate agricultural buildings and structures for violations of, and compliance with, building permit and code exemption qualifications. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agricultural Buildings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseThe committee(s) on AGR/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 11:15AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to AGR/WLH, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/AEN, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback