HI SB946 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 4. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero. Noes, 20 (Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Green, Ihara, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 4. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero. Noes, 20 (Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Green, Ihara, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to examine the unfunded liabilities of Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund. Establishes the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund Captive Insurance Company to effectively manage the administration and financing of the current and potential future other post employee benefit obligations of the state and county governments. Effective July 1, 2013. (CD1)
Title
EUTF; Task Force; Captive Insurance ($)
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 4. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero. Noes, 20 (Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Green, Ihara, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Carroll, Cheape, Choy, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Wooley, Yamane, Yamashita voting no (24) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Deferred until 05-02-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 130). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Baker; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 704). |
2013-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Johanson. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Baker, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Carroll, Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Ing, Ito, Johanson, Morikawa, Ohno, Onishi, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Kawakami, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Yamane, Yamashita voting no (15) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor amendment failed following a voice vote: Noes, 2 (Representative(s) Cachola, Evans). Excused, 0 (none). |
2013-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment No. 16 offered by Rep. Tokioka. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Ing, Lowen, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cullen, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Oshiro, Takayama, Tsuji, Ward, Yamane, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tokioka voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ing, Takumi, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Yamashita, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 252) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-13 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |