HI SB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB96
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires domestic and foreign corporations to provide their shareholders with reports of independent expenditures and political contributions.
Title
Relating To Corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB96 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB1251 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1251 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=96&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB96_.HTM |