HI SB960 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires registration of transient vacation rentals with the director of commerce and consumer affairs prior to operating or doing business in the State. Permits certain nonconforming uses of transient vacation rentals. Establishes penalties for noncompliance with registration requirements and allocates associated fines to the compliance resolution fund. Authorizes the counties to impose additional regulations. Creates searchable database. Registration requirements effective January 1, 2020.
Title
Relating To Transient Vacation Rentals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM/CPH, WAM/JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB960 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Compliance Resolution Fund
Database
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Registration
Transient Vacation Rentals
Database
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Registration
Transient Vacation Rentals
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=960&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB960_.HTM |