HI SB961 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 231, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 231, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends hearing requirements for petitions for assisted community treatment, including for deadlines, notice, court-appointed counsel, and examinations. Requires treating providers to provide information for purposes of the Department of Health's annual report. (SB961 HD3)
Title
Mental Health; Assisted Community Treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 231, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 231, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-29 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 691). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-15. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-29-15. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-15 2:35PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Har, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 554). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-24-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 242) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |