HI SB966 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1390).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopts the Uniform Mediation Act of the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Mediation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1390).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1390).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 66).
2013-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Belatti, Thielen.
2013-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596).
2013-04-09SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-04SenateDeferred until 04-05-13.
2013-04-03SenateDeferred until 04-04-13.
2013-04-02SenateDeferred until 04-03-13.
2013-04-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
2013-04-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3).
2013-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll.
2013-03-14HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2013-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback