HI SB966 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation to enter into negotiations to acquire the properties identified as Tax Map Keys: (1) 9-5-046:041 and (1) 9-5-046:042, parcels that are within or near Mililani Technology Park, to facilitate the redevelopment of those parcels for community benefit and the benefit of the Mililani Technology Park. Appropriates funds. (SB966 HD2)
Title
Relating To Mililani Technology Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; K. Kahele, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 758). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2149) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from EDB/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamashita. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB/WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TEC/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-13-19 2:04PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:22PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB966 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).