HI SB968 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB968
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Public Safety to inspect shipping containers for illegal fireworks and explosives. Establishes a shipping container inspection program using explosive-sniffing dogs and associated special fund. Authorizes Department of Transportation to impose shipping container import fees. Increases fine for fireworks violations.
Title
Relating To Cargo Inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB968 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to PSM/TRS, JDC/WAM.
HB858 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1102 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB858 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1102 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=968&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB968_.HTM |