HI SB969 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, requires each public elementary school or public charter elementary school to offer instruction in the basics of computer science and computational thinking. Beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, requires each public middle or intermediate school or public charter middle or intermediate school to offer instruction in exploratory computer science. Establishes reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Computer Science Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback