HI SB975 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public notice of sale of agricultural or preservation property subdivided as a condominium property regime in a planned community association within 90 days of subdivision and sale. Prohibits any residential use for any period of structures on agricultural and preservation land. In a county with a population of 750,000 or more, allows for county enforcement of state and county requirements on subdivided agricultural land based on community reports of suspected violations. Permits consideration of infrastructure and environmental impacts on applications for condominium projects on agricultural land. Requires the declaration in a condominium project developer's public report to specify that the project is in compliance with section 205-4.5(f), HRS. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To County Land Use Requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 312) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPH. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPH. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM/CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB975 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB306 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB306 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Agricultural Lands
Condominium Property Regimes
County Subdivision Requirements
Planned Community Associations
Condominium Property Regimes
County Subdivision Requirements
Planned Community Associations