HI SB976 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a pilot program to generate revenue through the lease of public library lands to meet the mission of the public libraries. Establishes the library facilities fund. Requires the Board of Education to report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds for a comprehensive planning study. (CD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Libraries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888).
2019-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970).
2019-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-04-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 05-02-19.
2019-04-30SenateReport filed.
2019-04-30SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-30SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
2019-04-30SenateFloor Amendment No. 23 offered.
2019-04-30HouseFloor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
2019-04-30HouseFloor Amendment No. 7 offered by Rep. Belatti.
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Yamane, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Kahele, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 760).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Thielen, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2172), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Har, Hashem, Lowen, McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (8).
2019-03-18HouseReported from LHE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Wildberger.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, DeCoite, Tokioka, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE/WLH on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:25PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 313) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-20-19 10:10AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU/WTL, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback