HI SB977 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each state government branch to establish a shared leave program for state employees. Allows the chief executive of a county to establish a shared leave program for county employees. Precludes a state government branch from prohibiting leave sharing between different departments or bargaining units because of administrative infeasibility. Allows an employee's designation of beneficiary form to be filed with the department where the employee is employed and permits the designation to be made through a statement that is not verified or written.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on GVO deferred the measure.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee on LCA deferred the measure.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to LCA/PSM/GVO, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback