HI SB981 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Hawaii Teacher Standards Board Special Fund and transfers the remaining balance to the general fund. Amends related HRS sections. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Teacher Standards Board Special Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 59) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 59).
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Matayoshi, DeCoite, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 3:30PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 1:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Hashem, Okimoto.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 678).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2091), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 315) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to EDU, WAM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback