HI SB982 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 217, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 217, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes limited immunity for individuals who seek medical assistance for themselves or others experiencing a drug or alcohol overdose. (SB982 HD2)
Title
Good Samaritan Policies; Medical Amnesty; Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Senate | Act 217, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). |
2015-07-08 | House | Act 217, on 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-28 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-28-15. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-28-15. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Espero, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 249) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-04-15 9:10AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 1:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB398 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1