HI SB984 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB984
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority in the list of health care professionals authorized to administer medication to public school students. Requires administration of the medication to be approved by the department of health or other on-campus, school based, health care provider pursuant to a written agreement with the department of education. (SB984 HD1)
Title
Relating To School Based Health Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LHE/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-12-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB984 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB920 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT/LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB920 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HLT/LHE, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse
Prescription Medications
Public Schools
School Based Health Services
Prescription Medications
Public Schools
School Based Health Services